MN HF196 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author stricken Mann
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author stricken Mann
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Seat belts required on newly purchased school buses.
Title
Seat belts required on newly purchased school buses.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] |
Rep. Todd Lippert [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author stricken Mann |
2019-02-11 | House | Author stricken Christensen |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF429 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy