MN HF1934 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Dehn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Dehn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Corrections Act subsidy increased, and money appropriated.
Title
Community Corrections Act subsidy increased, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Christensen and Miller |
2019-03-06 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2288 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy