MN HF1913 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Data Security Law established.
Title
Insurance Data Security Law established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 82 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1606 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1606 now on General Orders |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-04-12 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-04-12 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2021-04-12 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2021-04-12 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-04-12 | House | Amended |
2021-04-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 12, 2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1606 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1913