MN HF188 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Author stricken Scott.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Right to carry without a permit provided, and optional permit to carry provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right to carry without a permit provided, and optional permit to carry provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseAuthor stricken Scott.
2017-03-13HouseAuthor stricken Dettmer.
2017-03-08HouseAuthor stricken Pugh.
2017-02-13HouseAuthor added Kiel.
2017-02-06HouseAuthor added Backer.
2017-01-26HouseAuthor added Green.
2017-01-23HouseAuthors added Garofalo, Dettmer, Grossell, and Poston.
2017-01-19HouseAuthors added Bahr, C.; Miller; Franson; Christensen; and Loonan.
2017-01-17HouseAuthors added Scott, Pugh, Ecklund, Gruenhagen, Nornes, Erickson, and Daniels.
2017-01-12HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF650 (Similar To) 2017-02-13 - Author added Lang

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback