MN HF1871 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Jurgens
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Jurgens
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motorcycle endorsement fees increased.
Title
Motorcycle endorsement fees increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Anderson |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Franson |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Boe |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Morrison |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1565 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Authors added Osmek; Bakk