MN HF1871 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Jurgens
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motorcycle endorsement fees increased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycle endorsement fees increased.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseAuthor added Jurgens
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Anderson
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Franson
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Boe
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Morrison
2019-02-28HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1565 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Authors added Osmek; Bakk

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback