MN HF1870 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School districts allowed to base unrequested leave of absence and discharge and demotion decisions on teacher evaluation outcomes.
Title
School districts allowed to base unrequested leave of absence and discharge and demotion decisions on teacher evaluation outcomes.
Sponsors
Sen. Branden Petersen [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] |
Rep. Keith Downey [R] | Rep. Kirk Stensrud [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Connie Doepke [R] | Rep. Pam Myhra [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
Sen. Pam Wolf [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference Committee (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Kath motion to Re-Referral (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Kath motion to Re-Referral (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 274 | |
2012-04-30 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-28 | Senate | Third reading vote: 35-28 |
2012-04-28 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-28 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-28 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2012-04-26 | House | Author added Erickson |
2012-04-26 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 70-61 |
2012-04-26 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-04-26 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-04-26 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-03-12 | Senate | House conferee change Erickson replaces Kelly |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Senate conferees Wolf; Daley; Kruse; Olson; Bonoff |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2012-03-08 | Senate | House conferees Peterson, B.; Downey; Kelly; Woodward; Mariani |
2012-03-08 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2012-03-08 | House | House conferee change delete Kelly, add Erickson |
2012-03-08 | House | Senate conferees Wolf, Daley, Kruse, Olson, Bonoff |
2012-03-08 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2012-03-07 | House | House conferees Petersen, B.; Downey; Kelly; Woodard; Mariani |
2012-03-05 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2012-03-05 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-26 |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-02-22 | House | Author added Myhra |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-02-16 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 68-61 |
2012-02-16 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-02-16 | House | Amended |
2012-02-16 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 60-70 |
2012-02-16 | House | Motion to re-refer Education Reform |
2012-02-15 | House | Authors added Loon and Doepke |
2012-02-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-02-13 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-13 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-02-08 | House | Authors added Stensrud, Runbeck, and Scott |
2012-01-26 | House | Author added Downey |
2012-01-24 | House | Authors added Garofalo, Quam and Fabian |
2012-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Reform |