MN HF1867 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State agency hearing established for county to dispute liability for a portion of the cost of care of clients in regional treatment centers or state nursing facilities due to delayed discharge, and recovery of disputed costs of care from clients precluded.
Title
State agency hearing established for county to dispute liability for a portion of the cost of care of clients in regional treatment centers or state nursing facilities due to delayed discharge, and recovery of disputed costs of care from clients precluded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1982 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy