MN HF1851 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Author added Xiong
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Author added Xiong
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community services development program renamed as live well at home grants, projects and grants established, live well at home grants extended, and money appropriated.
Title
Community services development program renamed as live well at home grants, projects and grants established, live well at home grants extended, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Hicks [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Brion Curran [D] |
Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Author added Xiong |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2023-03-06 | House | Authors added Acomb; Baker |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-02-20 | House | Authors added Liebling; Bahner |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1902 (Similar To) 2023-03-27 - Author added Jasinski