MN HF1851 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Author added Baker
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Author added Baker
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Intractable pain definition modified, and intractable pain treatment through controlled substance prescription criteria modified.
Title
Intractable pain definition modified, and intractable pain treatment through controlled substance prescription criteria modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] |
Rep. Dave Baker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Author added Baker |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Vang |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Munson |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1485 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Author added Marty