MN HF1821 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Student Data Privacy Act created, and penalties provided.
Title
Student Data Privacy Act created, and penalties provided.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Policy |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added Erickson, Davnie, Liebling, and Moran |
2019-02-28 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2291 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy