MN HF182 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Author added Sanders.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Author added Sanders.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Compressed natural gas tax rate modified.
Title
Compressed natural gas tax rate modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Tim Sanders [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Author added Sanders. |
2015-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-01-26 | House | Author added Nornes. |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF983 (Similar To) 2015-04-21 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Taxes