MN HF1816 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Author added Zeleznikar
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Author added Zeleznikar
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The Redemption Project funding provided to assist inmates to transition from incarceration to the community, and money appropriated.
Title
The Redemption Project funding provided to assist inmates to transition from incarceration to the community, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2023-03-13 | House | Authors added Hudson, Curran, Engen, and Huot |
2023-02-28 | House | Author added Myers |
2023-02-20 | House | Author added Norris |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2866 (Similar To) 2023-03-13 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety