MN HF1813 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author changed Moran shown as chief author.
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author changed Moran shown as chief author.
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disparities impact report for new and existing programs required.
Title
Disparities impact report for new and existing programs required.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Author changed Moran shown as chief author. |
2017-05-21 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-03-07 | House | Author added Lee. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Moran. |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Funding Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1923 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance