MN HF1811 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Liberians; a resolution urging the President of the United States to continue Deferred Enforcement Departure (DED) for Liberians.
Title
Liberians; a resolution urging the President of the United States to continue Deferred Enforcement Departure (DED) for Liberians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1850 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Author added Abeler