MN HF179 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division
Pending: House Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division
Pending: House Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disability waiver rate system modified.
Title
Disability waiver rate system modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Gomez and Lueck |
2019-02-04 | House | Authors added Lee and Edelson. |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Layman |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Theis |
2019-01-22 | House | Authors added Dehn and Elkins |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF6 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy