MN HF173 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-18 - Author stricken Norris
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Equality under law provided, and constitutional amendment proposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equality under law provided, and constitutional amendment proposed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-18HouseAuthor stricken Norris
2024-05-13HouseAuthors added Pursell and Coulter
2024-04-18HouseAuthor added Sencer-Mura
2024-04-08HouseAuthor added Keeler
2024-02-22HouseAuthor added Hill
2024-02-19HouseAuthor added Rehm
2023-04-21HouseAuthor added PĂ©rez-Vega
2023-03-30HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2023-03-08HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
2023-02-27HouseAuthors added Reyer and Smith
2023-02-16HouseAuthor added Hicks
2023-01-17HouseAuthors added Moller and Bierman
2023-01-11HouseAuthors added Stephenson, Freiberg, Kotyza-Witthuhn, Tabke, and Agbaje
2023-01-09HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF37 (Similar To) 2024-05-19 - Laid on table

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback