MN HF1721 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Bierman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Bierman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco product definition amended to include electronic delivery devices, cigarette and tobacco product excise tax increased, special revenue fund tobacco prevention and cessation account established, and money appropriated.
Title
Tobacco product definition amended to include electronic delivery devices, cigarette and tobacco product excise tax increased, special revenue fund tobacco prevention and cessation account established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-03-10 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1774 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Author added Klein