MN HF1721 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Redevelopment demolition loans authorized, semiannual report eliminated, small business advocate office established in the Business Assistance Center, and Albert Lea granted the authority to establish an industrial sewer charge rebate program.
Title
Redevelopment demolition loans authorized, semiannual report eliminated, small business advocate office established in the Business Assistance Center, and Albert Lea granted the authority to establish an industrial sewer charge rebate program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - House - Repassage (Y: 111 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 110 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 110 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Secretary of State Chapter 288 | |
2012-05-10 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Third reading vote: 65-0 |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2012-05-07 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2012-05-07 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2012-05-07 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 111-17 |
2012-05-07 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-05-07 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-05-07 | House | Conference committee report |
2012-05-03 | House | Senate conferees Rosen, Pederson, Skoe |
2012-05-03 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Senate conferees Rosen; Pederson; Skoe |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2012-05-01 | Senate | House conferees Gunther; Murray; Mahoney |
2012-05-01 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-30 | House | House conferees Gunther, Murray, Mahoney |
2012-04-30 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-30 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-0 |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1441 |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-04-20 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 110-14 |
2012-04-20 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-04-20 | House | Amended |
2012-04-19 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Friday, April 20, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Thursday, April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-17 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Wednesday, April 18, 2012 |
2012-04-17 | House | Second reading |
2012-04-17 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-02-29 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2012-02-16 | House | Author added Westrom |
2011-05-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance |