MN HF171 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Hortman.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Hortman.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School building bonds agricultural credit established, and money appropriated.
Title
School building bonds agricultural credit established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Hortman. |
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2017-03-13 | House | Authors added Hilstrom and Koegel. |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF351 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Referred to E-12 Finance