MN HF1708 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Pelowski
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Pelowski
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hunger-free campus designation expanded, expiration repealed, and money appropriated.
Title
Hunger-free campus designation expanded, expiration repealed, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Pelowski |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Pryor |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1103 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Author added Rarick