MN HF1707 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Author added Erickson.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Author added Erickson.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources trust fund payment account established, trust fund payments to counties provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Environment and natural resources trust fund payment account established, trust fund payments to counties provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Author added Erickson. |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
2015-03-11 | House | Author added Heintzeman. |
2015-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1655 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Author added Westrom