MN HF1702 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 60 05/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Children age ten and over informed of the right to counsel and extended representation, waivers of counsel required in writing, and notice to counsel required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children age ten and over informed of the right to counsel and extended representation, waivers of counsel required in writing, and notice to counsel required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18 Secretary of State Chapter 60 05/17/17
2017-05-17 Governor's action Approval
2017-05-15 Presented to Governor
2017-05-12HouseBill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 122-0
2017-05-12HouseThird reading as amended by the Senate
2017-05-12HouseMotion prevailed
2017-05-12HouseMotion to concur with Senate amendments
2017-05-12HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2017-05-12SenateHouse concurred and repassed bill
2017-05-11SenateThird reading Passed vote: 63-0
2017-05-11SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2017-05-11HouseHouse rule 1.15, request for concurrence
2017-05-04SenateSecond reading
2017-05-04SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1386
2017-05-01SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1386, now on General Orders
2017-05-01SenateIntroduction and first reading
2017-05-01SenateReceived from House
2017-04-27HouseAuthor added O'Neill.
2017-04-27HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 130-0
2017-04-27HouseThird reading as amended
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
2017-03-16HouseAuthor added Ward.
2017-03-16HouseSecond reading
2017-03-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2017-03-15HouseAuthor added Lohmer.
2017-03-13HouseAuthor added Omar.
2017-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
2017-03-01HouseAuthor added Thissen.
2017-02-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1386 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - HF substituted on General Orders HF1702

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1702&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1702&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1702&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1702&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1702&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF1702&session_number=0&year=2017&id=197
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=4508
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF1702&session_number=0&year=2017&id=274

Bill Comments

feedback