MN HF170 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author added Schultz.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author added Schultz.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Neonicotinoid pesticide presence in wild deer study funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Neonicotinoid pesticide presence in wild deer study funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Susan Allen [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Author added Schultz. |
2017-01-17 | House | Author added Allen. |
2017-01-12 | House | Author added Dehn, R. |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF191 (Similar To) 2017-01-19 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance