MN HF1698 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public school building water lead testing required.
Title
Public school building water lead testing required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-02-27 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1561 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Author added Dziedzic