MN HF1686 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Author added Hornstein
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Author added Hornstein
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health crisis team referrals required via 911 system.
Title
Mental health crisis team referrals required via 911 system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2021-04-15 | House | Author added Her |
2021-04-14 | House | Author added Gomez |
2021-04-13 | House | Authors added Reyer and Bernardy |
2021-04-06 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Lippert |
2021-03-15 | House | Authors added Feist, Hollins and Frazier |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Howard |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1924 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Author added Klein