MN HF1680 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota legislature resolved to apologize on behalf of citizens of the state to all persons with mental illness and development and other disabilities who have been wrongfully committed to state institutions.
Title
Minnesota legislature resolved to apologize on behalf of citizens of the state to all persons with mental illness and development and other disabilities who have been wrongfully committed to state institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-18 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-15 | House: Returned from Senate | |
2010-05-15 | House: Amended | |
2010-05-15 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-05-15 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Third reading Passed | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Taken from table | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Laid on table | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Urgency declared rules suspended | |
2010-05-14 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-15 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-15 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2009-03-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Care and Human Services Policy and Oversight |