MN HF1645 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Author added Sauke.
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Author added Sauke.
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Somali Museum of Minnesota funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Somali Museum of Minnesota funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Dario Anselmo [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Duane Sauke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Sauke. |
2017-05-01 | House | Author added Loeffler. |
2017-03-06 | House | Author added Baker. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Anselmo. |
2017-02-27 | House | Authors added Thissen, Clark, and Lillie. |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Funding Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1697 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Author stricken Nelson