MN HF162 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Watershed district drainage system provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Watershed district drainage system provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bly [D] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
Rep. Alan Juhnke [D] | Rep. Bernie Lieder [D] | Rep. David Olin [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | House: HF indefinitely postponed | |
2010-04-15 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-13 | House: Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF364 | |
2010-04-08 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-02-25 | House: Second reading | |
2010-02-25 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-02-22 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections | |
2010-02-12 | House: Referred by Chair to Local Government Division | |
2009-02-12 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections | |
2009-01-26 | House: Author added Bly | |
2009-01-22 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment Policy and Oversight |