MN HF1609 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts enacted.
Title
Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts enacted.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Bob Loonan [R] |
Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-14 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF893 |
2018-05-07 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-04-26 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-04-26 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2018-04-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2018-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF893 (Similar To) 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed