MN HF1603 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Election and campaign finance; automatic voter registration and early voting provided, voting rights of persons with felony convictions restored, automatic absentee ballot delivery and ranked-choice voting authorized, National Popular Vote Interstate Compact adopted, campaign finance reporting requirements modified, expressly advocating definition modified, reporting of electioneering communications required, redistricting commission established, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election and campaign finance; automatic voter registration and early voting provided, voting rights of persons with felony convictions restored, automatic absentee ballot delivery and ranked-choice voting authorized, National Popular Vote Interstate Compact adopted, campaign finance reporting requirements modified, expressly advocating definition modified, reporting of electioneering communications required, redistricting commission established, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-03-28HouseReferred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
2019-03-28HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-21HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-21HouseRecalled by Chair Ways and Means
2019-03-20HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Government Operations
2019-02-26HouseReferred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
2019-02-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback