MN HF1569 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Christensen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Christensen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drinking water protection pilot program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Drinking water protection pilot program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] |
Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-03-11 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Water Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1637 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance