MN HF1564 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Pierson.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Pierson.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pregnant and parenting teen home visiting service funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Pregnant and parenting teen home visiting service funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Pierson. |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Pinto. |
2017-02-27 | House | Author added Theis. |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2118 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy