MN HF1560 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of Administrative Hearings disposition of contested case hearings provided.
Title
Office of Administrative Hearings disposition of contested case hearings provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 133 | |
2012-03-20 | Governor veto | |
2012-03-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-03-15 | House | Returned from Senate |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-28 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF993 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-01 | House | Bill was passed vote: 70-62 |
2012-03-01 | House | Third reading |
2012-02-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-02-08 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-08 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-01-30 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2011-04-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |