MN HF1552 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Jurgens
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Jurgens
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School bus equipping with external cameras grant program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
School bus equipping with external cameras grant program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] |
Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Daudt |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Vogel |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1509 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy