MN HF1502 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Salt applicator certification program established, and liability limited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Salt applicator certification program established, and liability limited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-04-04HouseAuthor added Her
2019-04-03HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-28HouseAuthors added Xiong, J.
2019-03-13HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-12HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Hausman
2019-03-06HouseDivision action, return to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-01HouseReferred by Chair to Water Division
2019-02-28HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Moller
2019-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1667 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback