MN HF150 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Author added Tabke
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Author added Tabke
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Inflation rate inclusion in state forecast required.
Title
Inflation rate inclusion in state forecast required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Tabke |
2020-02-11 | House | Authors added Bierman; Carlson, A.; Acomb; and Klevorn |
2019-01-22 | House | Authors added Elkins and Youakim |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |