MN HF1498 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human services agency provisions modified, and agency hearing and appeals provisions modified.
Title
Human services agency provisions modified, and agency hearing and appeals provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-05 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-03 | House | Author added Champion |
2011-04-28 | House | Second reading |
2011-04-28 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-04-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |