MN HF1478 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; unrequested leave of absence provisions modified.
Title
Teachers; unrequested leave of absence provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Drew Christensen [R] | Rep. Roz Peterson [R] |
Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] |
Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 71 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Laid on table |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Taken from table |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Laid on table |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-03-16 | House | Bill was passed vote: 71-59 |
2017-03-16 | House | Third reading |
2017-03-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-02-27 | House | Authors added Bahr, C., and Pugh. |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2127 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - Referred to E-12 Policy