MN HF147 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Theis
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Theis
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community paramedic and community medical response emergency medical technicians allowed to provide telemedicine services.
Title
Community paramedic and community medical response emergency medical technicians allowed to provide telemedicine services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Theis |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1073 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Second reading