MN HF147 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Surviving spouses of deceased service members and permanently disabled veterans market value exclusion extended.
Title
Surviving spouses of deceased service members and permanently disabled veterans market value exclusion extended.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Anna Wills [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] |
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2015-02-05 | House | Author added Atkins. |
2015-01-22 | House | Authors added Lien and Howe. |
2015-01-14 | House | Author added Uglem. |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF357 (Similar To) 2015-02-02 - Authors added Wiger; Weber