MN HF146 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Full-service community school funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Full-service community school funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
Rep. Susan Allen [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Mary Murphy [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Moran. |
2017-03-09 | House | Author added Murphy, M. |
2017-01-12 | House | Authors added Dehn, R., and Thissen. |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF7 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - Author added Eichorn