MN HF1449 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Automatic voter registration of applicants for a driver's license, instruction permit, or identification card provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatic voter registration of applicants for a driver's license, instruction permit, or identification card provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-13HouseAuthor added Loeffler.
2016-04-21HouseAuthor added Bernardy.
2016-04-20HouseAuthors added Isaacson and Yarusso.
2016-04-18HouseAuthors added Schoen; Davnie; Dehn, R; and Johnson, S.
2016-04-14HouseAuthor added Ecklund.
2016-03-08HouseAuthor added Hausman.
2015-04-25HouseAuthor added Murphy, M.
2015-04-20HouseAuthor added Moran.
2015-04-16HouseAuthor added Kahn.
2015-04-13HouseAuthor added Youakim.
2015-03-25HouseAuthor added Lien.
2015-03-16HouseAuthor added Erhardt.
2015-03-10HouseAuthor added Hortman.
2015-03-09HouseAuthors added Fischer and Pinto.
2015-03-05HouseAuthors added Ward and Freiberg.
2015-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1346 (Similar To) 2015-03-12 - Author added Carlson

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback