MN HF1426 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Congressional districting plan for use in 2012 and thereafter adopted, and districting principles adopted for legislative and congressional districts.
Title
Congressional districting plan for use in 2012 and thereafter adopted, and districting principles adopted for legislative and congressional districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] |
Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Sen. Geoffrey Michel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-13 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 36 | |
2011-05-19 | Governor veto | |
2011-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-17 | House | Returned from Senate |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-28 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Motion did not prevail To strike and re-refer to the Rules and Administration |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2011-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2011-05-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-05-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-05-13 | House | Bill was passed vote: 71-61 |
2011-05-13 | House | Third reading |
2011-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-12 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2011-05-11 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2011-04-14 | House | Authors added Fabian, Daudt, Loon, Garofalo, Hoppe and Scott |
2011-04-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Redistricting |