MN HF141 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Port authorities; majority vote of commissioners required to approve real property sales and transfers.
Title
Port authorities; majority vote of commissioners required to approve real property sales and transfers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-07 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-28 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF571 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy