MN HF1405 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clean Energy First Act established, electric utilities required to meet resource needs using clean energy resources, cost recovery authorized, pilot project established, and reports required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy First Act established, electric utilities required to meet resource needs using clean energy resources, cost recovery authorized, pilot project established, and reports required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-13HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2020-04-28HouseAuthor added Bierman
2020-04-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division
2020-03-26HouseAuthors added Jordan, Christensen
2020-03-11HouseAuthor added Lillie
2020-03-11HouseCommittee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2020-03-03HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2020-02-26HouseAuthor added Acomb
2020-02-20HouseAuthor added Long
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Sandell
2019-02-18HouseReferred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1456 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback