MN HF136 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-17 - Author added Bakeberg
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-17 - Author added Bakeberg
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individual income tax provisions modified, and unlimited Social Security subtraction allowed.
Title
Individual income tax provisions modified, and unlimited Social Security subtraction allowed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-17 | House | Author added Bakeberg |
2023-01-11 | House | Authors added Witte; Backer; Anderson, P. H.; Bennett; Hudson; Mekeland; Garofalo; McDonald; and Altendorf |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF95 (Similar To) 2023-01-23 - Author added Kreun