MN HF136 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Internet service providers serving Minnesota customers and those under contract to the state or political subdivisions prohibited certain activities, and monetary fines authorized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet service providers serving Minnesota customers and those under contract to the state or political subdivisions prohibited certain activities, and monetary fines authorized.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-03-21HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-03-21HouseAuthor added Olson
2019-03-20HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-12HouseReferred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Koegel
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-01-28HouseAuthors added Moller and Howard
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF317 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Author added Marty

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback