MN HF1357 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement prohibited from using tear gas for crowd control.
Title
Law enforcement prohibited from using tear gas for crowd control.
Sponsors
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-04-16 | House | Authors added Frazier, Freiberg and Lee |
2021-04-12 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |