MN HF1342 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-16 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-16 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus workforce and business development bill.
Title
Omnibus workforce and business development bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2021-04-16 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1098 |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1098 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - House conferees Noor; Ecklund; Olson, L.; Berg; Hamilton